MA H799 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to nitrogen impaired embayments By Mr. Schmid of Westport, a petition of Paul A. Schmid, III and others that coastal estuary or embayment watersheds impaired due to nitrogen pollution be deemed to be nitrogen sensitive areas. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to nitrogen impaired embayments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2013-09-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2013 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H799 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H799.pdf |