MA H818 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4453
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4453
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4453
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the protection of property owned by the Commonwealth and part of the Blue Hill Reservation referred to as Fowl Meadow. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to the preservation of land designated areas of critical concern
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-11 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4453 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-05-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday June 15, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-03-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/21/2013 from 02:30 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4453 (Replaced by) 2014-09-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H818 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H818.pdf |