MA H846 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3866
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3866
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3866
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the use of crossbows in hunting. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to the use of crossbows in hunting
Sponsors
Rep. William Pignatelli [D] | Rep. Paul Schmid [D] | Sen. Dean Tran [R] | Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R] |
Rep. John Barrett [D] | Rep. Jonathan Zlotnik [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3866 |
2019-04-17 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 04/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222 |
2019-04-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H754 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5013
S489 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S451 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S467 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S468 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
S471 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
S487 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
S488 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied S467
S475 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
H3866 (Replaced by) 2019-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3926 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4610
H4138 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S489 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S451 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S467 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S468 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
S471 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
S487 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
S488 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied S467
S475 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
H3866 (Replaced by) 2019-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3926 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4610
H4138 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H846 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H846.pdf |