MA H847 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-10 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading, with the amendment pending
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-10 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading, with the amendment pending
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide that cytologic screenings performed at the same time as annual physical examinations be separately billed by health care providers and paid by insurers. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to promoting women's health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading, with the amendment pending |
2014-05-19 | House | Bill referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2014-05-19 | House | Committee recommends ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4086 |
2013-07-03 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee on Health Care Financing |
2013-09-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/12/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H847 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H847.pdf |