MA H856 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4735
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4735
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4735
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Madaro of Boston, a petition of Adrian C. Madaro that the Secretary of Energy and Environmental Affairs establish a special board to identify and assess the cumulative social, economic and public health impacts of permissible land uses and water uses within designated port areas in environmental justice communities. Environment and Natural Resources.
Title
Assessing environmental justice in designated port areas
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4735 |
2023-09-14 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-09-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
S2113 (Similar To) 2024-06-10 - House concurred
H4143 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
S2521 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
H4735 (Replaced by) 2024-07-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4143 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
S2521 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
H4735 (Replaced by) 2024-07-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H856 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H856.pdf |