MA H857 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Accompanied S537
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Accompanied S537
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to agricultural disaster relief. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to agricultural disaster relief
Sponsors
Rep. Natalie Blais [D] | Sen. Anne Gobi [D] | Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D] | Rep. Paul Schmid [D] |
Rep. David Robertson [D] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. Vanna Howard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | Accompanied S537 |
2021-10-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/03/2021 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S537 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H90 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H3702
S35 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - See H90
H4020 (Similar To) 2022-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2022
H4059 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2535 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3094
S2529 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1302 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
S791 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H538 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S217 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S332 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S532 (Similar To) 2021-11-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S505 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5047 (Similar To) 2022-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2022
S3088 (Similar To) 2022-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2022
H90 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H3702
S35 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - See H90
H4020 (Similar To) 2022-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2022
H4059 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2535 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3094
S2529 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1302 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
S791 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H538 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S217 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S332 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S532 (Similar To) 2021-11-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S505 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5047 (Similar To) 2022-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2022
S3088 (Similar To) 2022-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H857 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H857.pdf |