MA H868 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a grant program for low noise and emissions landscape maintenance equipment. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To establish a grant program for low noise, low emissions landscape maintenance equipment
Sponsors
Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D] | Rep. Christina Minicucci [D] | Rep. Mindy Domb [D] | Rep. Carmine Gentile [D] |
Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Rep. Kate Lipper-Garabedian [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-10-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2021 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S288 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2883
S384 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S312 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2883
H1316 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S744 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied H1316
S370 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2525
S293 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S384 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S312 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2883
H1316 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S744 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied H1316
S370 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2525
S293 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H868 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H868.pdf |