MA H88 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to creating and expanding access to opportunity in low-opportunity communities. Community Development and Small Businesses.
Title
Resolve providing for an investigation and study by a special commission (including members of the General Court) relative to creating and expanding access to opportunity in low-opportunity communities
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Kaufman [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D] | Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] |
Rep. Cheryl Coakley-Rivera [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Alice Wolf [D] | Rep. Frank Smizik [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-04-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint committee on Rules |
2011-07-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/29/2011 from 10:30 AM-12:30 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Community Development and Small Businesses |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H88 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10644&generalCourtId=1 |