MA H888 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3810
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3810
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3810
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to secured lending by the Federal Home Loan Bank. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to secured lending by the Federal Home Loan Bank
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-12 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3810 |
2013-12-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/10/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H3810 (Replaced by) 2015-01-08 - Pocket vetoed
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H888 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H888.pdf |