MA H893 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5012
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the disposal of sea mammals on metropolitan beaches. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to the disposal of sea mammals on metropolitan beaches
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-13 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5012 |
2019-06-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 12:30 PM-04:00 PM in Division of Fisheries and Wildlife |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H759 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5116
H803 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H895 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4414
S537 (Similar To) 2020-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S440 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S498 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
S532 (Similar To) 2020-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H809 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H3652 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H5012 (Replaced by) 2020-10-13 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H803 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H895 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4414
S537 (Similar To) 2020-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S440 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S498 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
S532 (Similar To) 2020-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H809 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H3652 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H5012 (Replaced by) 2020-10-13 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H893 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H893.pdf |