MA H898 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4668
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4668
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4668
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Scarsdale of Pepperell, a petition of Margaret R. Scarsdale for an investigation of appropriate staffing levels and resources necessary to carry out climate change response planning and strategy at the regional level. Environment and Natural Resources.
Title
Resolve for a climate change staffing study
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-23 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4668 |
2023-05-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/17/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
S514 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2649
H4289 (Similar To) 2024-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2668 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4668 (Replaced by) 2024-05-23 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2922 (Similar To) 2024-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4289 (Similar To) 2024-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2668 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4668 (Replaced by) 2024-05-23 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2922 (Similar To) 2024-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H898 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H898.pdf |