MA H899 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4263
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4263
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4263
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Bruce J. Ayers of Quincy, petition of Bruce J. Ayers that cities and towns be authorized to issue temporary placards for handicapped parking spaces
Title
Allowing cities and towns the authority to issue temporary parking identification placards to the temporarily disabled.
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-16 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4263 |
2012-02-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2011 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H4263 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H899 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=8395&generalCourtId=1 |