MA H90 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5088
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5088
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5088
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish additional mandated reporters for the purposes of the protection and care of children. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
To authorize the Commonwealth of Massachusetts to establish additional mandated reporters for the purpose of the protection and care of children
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5088 |
2019-03-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/26/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H3215 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
S926 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S47 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2532
S977 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H5088 (Replaced by) 2020-11-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S926 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S47 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2532
S977 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H5088 (Replaced by) 2020-11-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H90 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H90.pdf |