MA H933 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to unclaimed life insurance benefits. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to unclaimed life insurance benefits
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-10-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H53 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S643 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S2167 (Similar To) 2021-01-05 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3195 (Similar To) 2020-10-19 - House concurred
S643 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S2167 (Similar To) 2021-01-05 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3195 (Similar To) 2020-10-19 - House concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H933 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H933.pdf |