MA H935 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to direct the Attorney General to provide for a study of the methodology used to promulgate new flood insurance rate maps through the National Flood Insurance Program. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to an investigation of flood insurance by the attorney general
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-05-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A2 and virtual |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H935 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H935.pdf |