MA H936 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4621
Note: Legislation replaced by H4996
Note: Legislation replaced by H4996
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4996
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4996
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that certain health insurance policies include coverage for eating disorders
Title
Providing for certain standards in health care insurance coverage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-23 | Accompanied a study order, see H4996 | |
2010-05-04 | Discharged from committee and recommitted to the committee on Joint Committee on Financial Services | |
2010-05-04 | Reported on a part of H4621 | |
2010-05-04 | Reported from the committee on House Committee On Rules | |
2010-04-22 | Accompanied a study order, see H4621 | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the committee on Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/House/H936 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=3042&generalCourtId=2 |