MA H937 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Accompanied S602
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Accompanied S602
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the display of information on enrollment cards of health plans. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to transparency of consumer health insurance rights
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Balser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Accompanied S602 |
2024-02-22 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2023-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/26/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S602 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3566 (Similar To) 2024-05-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4593
H4890 (Similar To) 2024-07-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 141 of the Acts of 2024
H3566 (Similar To) 2024-05-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4593
H4890 (Similar To) 2024-07-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 141 of the Acts of 2024
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H937 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H937.pdf |