MA H941 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2170
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to properly punish the solicitation of felony crimes. The Judiciary.
Title
To properly punish the solicitation of felony crimes
Sponsors
Rep. David Rogers [D] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Rep. Mike Connolly [D] | Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D] |
Rep. Marjorie Decker [D] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Rep. Paul Brodeur [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-02 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2170 |
2017-06-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S941 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S857 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H1835 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
S2170 (Replaced by) 2017-11-02 - Ways and Means amendment adopted, as amended, see S2185
S857 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H1835 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
S2170 (Replaced by) 2017-11-02 - Ways and Means amendment adopted, as amended, see S2185
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H941 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H941.pdf |