MA H942 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. Reinstein of Revere, a petition of Kathi-Anne Reinstein and Robert L. Hedlund regulating the display of red and blue flashing, rotating or oscillating lights. Transportation.
Title
Relative to red and blue flashing, rotating or oscillating lights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-06-20 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-06-18 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-06-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-01-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/14/2011 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H942 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=11405&generalCourtId=1 |