MA H943 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4111
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to insurance coverage for fluoride varnish services for moderate to high caries risk patients. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to fluoride varnish services for moderate to high caries risk patients
Sponsors
Rep. John Scibak [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4111 |
2015-10-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H4111 (Replaced by) 2016-04-04 - Reported, in part, by H948
H944 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1032 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H2056 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H945 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H263 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H944 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1032 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H2056 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H945 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H263 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H943 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H943.pdf |