MA H981 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to child placement enforcement by the Department of Early Education and Care. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Pertaining to violations of the Department of Early Education and Care advertising law
Sponsors
Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. George Ross [R] | Rep. James Murphy [D] | Rep. Alice Wolf [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2011-07-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2011-06-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/03/2011 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H981 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10256&generalCourtId=1 |