MA H981 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5236
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5236
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5236
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Peake of Provincetown and Senator Cyr, a joint petition of Sarah K. Peake and Julian Cyr (by vote of the town) that the director of the office of fishing and boating access be authorized to issue an annual general permit to the town of Orleans to permit swimming from the state-owned properties located on Bakers Pond road. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the director of the state office of fishing and boating access to issue an annual general permit to the town of Orleans to permit swimming from the state-owned properties located on bakers pond road
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Peake [D] | Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5236 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday May 12, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-04-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/04/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H3969 (Similar To) 2022-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 309 of the Acts of 2022
H2196 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 389 of the Acts of 2022
H5236 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2196 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 389 of the Acts of 2022
H5236 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H981 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H981.pdf |