MA H985 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5041
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Pease of Westfield, a petition of Kelly W. Pease and others that the Department of Environmental Protection authorize a study of the effect of per- and polyfluoroalkyl substances in commercial products. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Studying the effect of per- and polyfluoroalkyl substances in commercial products
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5041 |
2021-06-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S624 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
H5041 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5041 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H985 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H985.pdf |