MA H990 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2170
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to decriminalize certain non-violent demonstrations by students. The Judiciary.
Title
Decriminalizing non-violent and verbal student misconduct
Sponsors
Rep. Bud Williams [D] | Rep. Michelle DuBois [D] | Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Natalie Higgins [D] |
Rep. Juana Matias [D] | Rep. James O'Day [D] | Rep. Chynah Tyler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-02 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2170 |
2017-06-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1915 (Similar To) 2018-01-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H330 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H239 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H265 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
H228 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4632
S2170 (Replaced by) 2017-11-02 - Ways and Means amendment adopted, as amended, see S2185
H41 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2390 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
H330 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H239 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H265 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
H228 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4632
S2170 (Replaced by) 2017-11-02 - Ways and Means amendment adopted, as amended, see S2185
H41 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2390 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H990 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H990.pdf |