MA H997 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-30 - Accompanied a study order, H4418
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-30 - Accompanied a study order, H4418
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the rehabilitation of community resources. Community Development and Small Businesses.
Title
Relative to the rehabilitation of community resources
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-30 | House | Accompanied a study order, H4418 |
2011-04-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/13/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Community Development and Small Businesses |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H997 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=7670&generalCourtId=1 |