MA S10 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-04 - Reported from the Temporary Committee on Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-04 - Reported from the Temporary Committee on Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposed Senate Rules for the 2021-2022 Legislative Session
Title
Proposed Senate Rules for the 2021-2022 Legislative Session
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #13 (Y: 4 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #15 (Y: 5 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #14 (Y: 5 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #12 (Y: 5 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #11 (Y: 6 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #10 (Y: 7 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #9 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #8 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #7 (Y: 5 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #6 (Y: 10 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #5 (Y: 6 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #4 (Y: 6 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #3 (Y: 6 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #2 (Y: 4 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #15 (Y: 5 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #14 (Y: 5 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #12 (Y: 5 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #11 (Y: 6 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #10 (Y: 7 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #9 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #8 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #7 (Y: 5 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #6 (Y: 10 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #5 (Y: 6 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #4 (Y: 6 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #3 (Y: 6 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #2 (Y: 4 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reported from the Temporary Committee on Rules |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 11, 2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Tarr) rejected |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Tarr) rejected -see Roll Call #2 (4 Yeas - 35 Nays) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Tarr) rejected |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #5 (Tarr) rejected |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #6 (Tarr) rejected -see Roll Call #3 (6 Yeas to 34 Nays) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #7 (Tarr) rejected -see Roll Call #4 (6 Yeas to 34 Nays) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #8 (Tarr) rejected -see Roll Call #5 (6 Yeas to 34 Nays) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #9 (Tarr) rejected |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #10 (Tarr) rejected |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #11 (DiZoglio) rejected |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #13 (DiZoglio) adopted |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #14 (DiZoglio) rejected |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #15 (DiZoglio) rejected -see Roll Call #6 (10 Yeas to 29 Nays) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #16 (DiZoglio) rejected |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #17 (DiZoglio) adopted |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #18 (DiZoglio) rejected |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #19 (DiZoglio) adopted |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #20 (DiZoglio) rejected -see Roll Call #7 (5 Yeas to 34 Nays) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #21 (DiZoglio) rejected |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #22 (DiZoglio) rejected |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #23 (DiZoglio) rejected |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #25 (DiZoglio) rejected |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #26 (DiZoglio) rejected |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #27 (DiZoglio) rejected |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #28 (DiZoglio) adopted -see Roll Call #8 (39 Yeas to 0 Nays) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #29 (DiZoglio) adopted -see Roll Call #9 (39 Yeas - 0 Nays) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #31 (DiZoglio) rejected |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #32 (Keenan) rejected |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #33 (Keenan) rejected |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #34 (Keenan) rejected |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #35 (Tarr) rejected |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #36 (Tarr) rejected |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #37 (Rausch) rejected |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #40 (Tarr) adopted |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #42 (Tarr) rejected -see Roll Call #10 (7 Yeas - 32 Nays) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #43 (Tarr) rejected |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #44 (Tarr) rejected -see Roll Call #11 (6 Yeas - 33 Nays) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #45 (Fattman) rejected |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #46.1 (Tarr) rejected |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #46 (Fattman) rejected |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #48 (Fattman) rejected |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #47 (Fattman) laid aside as duplicative |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #49 (Fattman) rejected -see Roll Call #12 (5 Yeas - 34 Nays) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #50 (Fattman) rejected -see Roll Call #13 (4 Yeas - 35 Nays) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #51 (Fattman) rejected |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #24 (DiZoglio) rejected -see Roll Call #14 (5 Yeas to 34 Nays) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #30 (DiZoglio) rejected |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #12 (DiZoglio) rejected |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Tarr) rejected -see Roll Call #15 (5 Yeas to 34 Nays) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #41 (Lovely) adopted |
Same As/Similar To
S39 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Report accepted, in concurrence
S14 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S11 (Similar To) 2021-02-11 - Reprinted as amended, see S14
S12 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Amendment #3 (Lovely) adopted
H3930 (Similar To) 2021-07-07 - Published as amended, see H3932
S14 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S11 (Similar To) 2021-02-11 - Reprinted as amended, see S14
S12 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Amendment #3 (Lovely) adopted
H3930 (Similar To) 2021-07-07 - Published as amended, see H3932