MA S1006 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2109
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2109
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2109
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to diversify the use of the Workforce Training Fund to support the Workforce Competitiveness Trust Fund. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
To diversify the use of the Workforce Training Fund to support the Workforce Competitiveness Trust Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2109 |
2017-05-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/30/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1005 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied H3160
S1637 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1579 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S177 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2486
H3145 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied H3160
H3147 (Similar To) 2017-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3804
H1624 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S2109 (Replaced by) 2017-10-26 - New draft substituted, see S2192
S1637 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1579 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S177 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2486
H3145 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied H3160
H3147 (Similar To) 2017-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3804
H1624 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S2109 (Replaced by) 2017-10-26 - New draft substituted, see S2192
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1006 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1006.pdf |