MA S1012 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2490
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the penalty for employers who knowingly falsify employment or citizenship documents. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Encouraging integrity in hiring
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Fattman [R] | Rep. James Miceli [D] | Sen. Richard Ross [R] | Rep. Jonathan Zlotnik [D] |
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2490 |
2017-04-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S314 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
H3190 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H363 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
S2490 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Reported (in part) by S1014
H3190 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H363 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
S2490 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Reported (in part) by S1014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1012 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1012.pdf |