MA S1018 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2300
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-12 - New draft substituted, see S2300
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-12 - New draft substituted, see S2300
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to enforce municipal ordinances and bylaws. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
An Act relative to the effective enforcement of municipal ordinances and bylaws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-12 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2300 |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Read second |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefore a new draft, see S2300 |
2012-03-15 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2011-06-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/29/2011 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S2300 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1018 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=7702&generalCourtId=1 |