MA S1027 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2356
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require health care coverage for the emergency psychiatric services. Mental Health and Substance Abuse.
Title
To require health care coverage for the emergency psychiatric services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2356 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2015-10-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-09-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse |
Same As/Similar To
S2356 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S568 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S102 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S618 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - New draft substituted, see S2137
S2137 (Similar To) 2016-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 233 of the Acts of 2016
S474 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S421 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S508 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
H2088 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H840 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
S568 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S102 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S618 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - New draft substituted, see S2137
S2137 (Similar To) 2016-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 233 of the Acts of 2016
S474 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S421 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S508 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
H2088 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H840 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1027 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1027.pdf |