MA S1035 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to plant relocation and severance. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to plant relocation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-11-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/13/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H805 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H794 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H1776 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3041 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4149 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
H794 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H1776 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3041 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4149 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1035 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1035.pdf |