MA S1035 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2496
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to involuntary holds for overdose treatment. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to involuntary holds for overdose treatment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2496 |
2019-09-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1711 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
S1151 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1725 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1712 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4723
S2496 (Replaced by) 2020-02-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1151 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1725 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1712 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4723
S2496 (Replaced by) 2020-02-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1035 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1035.pdf |