MA S1046 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2437
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2437
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2437
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote municipal efficiency and innovation through regional collaboration. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
To promote municipal collaboration and regionalization throughout the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Moore [D] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
Sen. Karen Spilka [D] | Sen. James Timilty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2437 |
2011-06-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/29/2011 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government. |
2011-01-21 | Senate | Bill Filed. |
Same As/Similar To
S2437 (Replaced by) 2012-10-15 - Reportd (in part) by S2017
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1046 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14331&generalCourtId=1 |