MA S1050 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 174 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 174 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to a certain parcel of land in the city of Taunton. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Taunton to lease a certain parcel of land
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-16 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 174 of the Acts of 2011 | |
2011-11-10 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2011-11-10 | Senate | Enacted - see Roll Call #117 (35 Yeas - 0 Nays) |
2011-11-02 | House | Enacted - 150 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 140) |
2011-11-02 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2011-11-01 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-10-31 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2011-10-26 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-10-24 | Senate | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2011-10-24 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-07-21 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2011-07-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2011 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1050 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=12711&generalCourtId=1 |