MA S1062 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-29 - Recommitted to the committee on Labor and Workforce Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-29 - Recommitted to the committee on Labor and Workforce Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to wage theft and due process. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to wage theft and due process
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-29 | Senate | Recommitted to the committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass under (Joint Rule 10) |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-06-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday October 27, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-01-30 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 5, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-05-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1066 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Recommitted to the committee on Labor and Workforce Development
H1610 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5086
H1610 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5086
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1062 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1062.pdf |