MA S1063 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2437
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2437
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2437
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to appoint of town managers
Title
Relative to the appointment of town managers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2437 |
2011-04-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/12/2011 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government. |
2011-01-18 | Senate | Bill Filed. |
Same As/Similar To
S2437 (Replaced by) 2012-10-15 - Reportd (in part) by S2017
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1063 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=9669&generalCourtId=1 |