MA S1068 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2401
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2401
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2401
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect injured workers. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Protecting injured workers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2401 |
2019-06-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1111 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
H2750 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1670 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4174
H4174 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2401 (Replaced by) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2750 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1670 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4174
H4174 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2401 (Replaced by) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1068 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1068.pdf |