MA S1091 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to local review for public structures. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to local review for public structures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-09-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2015 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S224 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Discharged from a part of S2215 to the committee on Senate Rules
S116 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2145
S691 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S2285 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - See H3611
S2333 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - See S2311
S2332 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - See S2311
S623 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1847 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1840 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
H1536 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4109
H691 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S116 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2145
S691 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S2285 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - See H3611
S2333 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - See S2311
S2332 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - See S2311
S623 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1847 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1840 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
H1536 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4109
H691 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1091 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1091.pdf |