MA S1097 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to fair hiring practices. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to fair hiring practices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-04 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-06-21 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-06-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H2377 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S74 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2532
S1544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S74 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2532
S1544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1097 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1097.pdf |