MA S1103 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2370
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-6)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-28 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2370
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-28 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2370
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect animals during pet sales. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to protecting puppies and kittens
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-28 | Senate | New draft substituted, as amended, see S2370 |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Read second |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Tuesday, June 28, 2016 |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2370 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-01-19 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 01/21/2016 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2016-01-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/21/2016 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S2370 (Replaced by) 2016-06-28 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2390
S401 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S439 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
H713 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S876 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S401 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S439 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
H713 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S876 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1103 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1103.pdf |