MA S1103 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2665
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to update the definition of leaving the scene of an accident aka Katie's Law. The Judiciary.
Title
To update the definition of leaving the scene of an accident aka Katie Brienzo's Law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2665 |
2021-12-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/14/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1484 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1925 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S549 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2665 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3487 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2541 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5320
H1925 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S549 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2665 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3487 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2541 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5320
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1103 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1103.pdf |