MA S1105 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2440
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2440
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2440
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect public health, promote accountability and prevent the violation of individual rights through the misuse – abuse & the violation of law. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
To protect public health, promote accountability and prevent the violation of individual rights through the misuse – abuse & the violation of law by amending Chapter 123 Section 12
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2440 |
2017-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/08/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
S803 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1360 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied S1380
S485 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
S1083 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2440
S1328 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2037 (Similar To) 2017-03-03 - See H68
S1904 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S1470 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1472 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S972 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S849 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H2411 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H2501 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2060 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Again adopted and placed on file
H1860 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1437 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2532 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H24 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
S2440 (Replaced by) 2018-05-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2614 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 217 of the Acts of 2018
S1360 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied S1380
S485 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
S1083 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2440
S1328 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2037 (Similar To) 2017-03-03 - See H68
S1904 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S1470 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1472 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S972 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S849 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H2411 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H2501 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2060 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Again adopted and placed on file
H1860 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1437 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2532 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H24 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
S2440 (Replaced by) 2018-05-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2614 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 217 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1105 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1105.pdf |