MA S1106 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2174
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-17 - Accompanied H2174
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-17 - Accompanied H2174
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the Massachusetts Emergency Information Program. Public Health.
Title
Relative to the Massachusetts Emergency Information Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | House | Accompanied H2174 |
2014-01-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/11/2014 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-10-07 | House | House concurred |
2013-10-03 | Senate | Discharged to the Senate Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H2174 (Replaced by) 2014-06-11 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1106 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1106.pdf |