MA S1110 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase the amount that can be appropriated from the balance of a capital project fund. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
To increase the amount that may be appropriated from the balance of a capital project fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-14 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2015-07-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S2162 (Similar To) 2016-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H505 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
S272 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2341
S635 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2381
S681 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
H505 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
S272 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2341
S635 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2381
S681 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1110 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1110.pdf |