MA S1119 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2637
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2637
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2637
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to employment protections for medical marijuana patients. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to employment protections for medical marijuana patients
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-21 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2637 |
2019-12-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/17/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-04-08 | House | House concurred |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Cannabis Policy |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1159 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2550
S613 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - New draft substituted, see S2935
H990 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1885 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4444
S686 (Similar To) 2019-07-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S542 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S1285 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1720 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Accompanied S1164
H947 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S2637 (Replaced by) 2020-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S613 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - New draft substituted, see S2935
H990 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1885 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4444
S686 (Similar To) 2019-07-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S542 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S1285 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1720 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Accompanied S1164
H947 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S2637 (Replaced by) 2020-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1119 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1119.pdf |