MA S1137 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2117
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-16)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2117
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2117
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to police pursuits in the Commonwealth. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to police pursuits in the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2117 |
2013-09-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2013 from 10:00 AM-12:30 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S2117 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1137 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1137.pdf |