MA S1154 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2888
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2888
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2888
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect children's mental health services. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
To protect children's mental health services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-06 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2888 |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-07-30 | House | House adopted, in concurrence |
2020-07-30 | House | Amendment adopted |
2020-06-01 | House | House concurred |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-27 | House | House concurred |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday May 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-06 | House | House concurred |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-07-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
H328 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H3352 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S344 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H3390 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S130 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H3476 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H159 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3433 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H132 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5088
S872 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3471 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2227 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4013 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Adopted, see H4012
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
H4083 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4163
S2349 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2368 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - See H4012
S2377 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - See H4012
S2888 (Replaced by) 2020-08-13 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3352 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S344 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H3390 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S130 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H3476 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H159 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3433 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H132 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5088
S872 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3471 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2227 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4013 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Adopted, see H4012
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
H4083 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4163
S2349 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2368 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - See H4012
S2377 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - See H4012
S2888 (Replaced by) 2020-08-13 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1154 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1154.pdf |