MA S1167 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2633
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2633
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2633
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the penalty for employers who knowingly falsify employment or citizenship documents. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Encouraging employer integrity in hiring
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2633 |
2023-10-30 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 11/14/2023 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in B-2 |
2023-10-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S2633 (Replaced by) 2024-02-15 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4638 (Similar To) 2024-06-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4768 (Similar To) 2024-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 157 of the Acts of 2024
H4638 (Similar To) 2024-06-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4768 (Similar To) 2024-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 157 of the Acts of 2024
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1167 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1167.pdf |