MA S1168 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2126
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-11 - New draft substituted, see S2126
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-11 - New draft substituted, see S2126
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to modernize firm leadership structures. Public Health.
Title
To modernize firm leadership structures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-11 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2126 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read second |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 11, 2016 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2126 |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-10-07 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/13/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in 222 |
2015-06-22 | House | House concurred |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S2126 (Replaced by) 2016-02-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3049 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4612
S2508 (Similar To) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 435 of the Acts of 2016
S183 (Similar To) 2016-02-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S460 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2108
H164 (Similar To) 2016-02-04 - Accompanied S149
H493 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
H3049 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4612
S2508 (Similar To) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 435 of the Acts of 2016
S183 (Similar To) 2016-02-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S460 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2108
H164 (Similar To) 2016-02-04 - Accompanied S149
H493 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1168 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1168.pdf |