MA S1174 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2535
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to enhance sexual assault evidence kit collection. Public Health.
Title
Relative to enhancing sexual assault evidence kit collection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2535 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2017-12-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1241 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - New draft substituted, see S2567
S835 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied H2289
S929 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S902 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H2998 (Similar To) 2018-01-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4159
H1165 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3465 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4427
S1094 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2440
H776 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H777 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2535 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Reported (in part) by S1256
S835 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied H2289
S929 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S902 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H2998 (Similar To) 2018-01-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4159
H1165 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3465 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4427
S1094 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2440
H776 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H777 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2535 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Reported (in part) by S1256
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1174 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1174.pdf |